Text: H.R.1053 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-205 (03/23/2006)

 
[109th Congress Public Law 205]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ205.109]

[[Page 120 STAT. 313]]

Public Law 109-205
109th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To authorize the extension of nondiscriminatory treatment (normal trade 
   relations treatment) to the products of Ukraine. <<NOTE: Mar. 23, 
                         2006 -  [H.R. 1053]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 19 USC 2434 note.>> FINDINGS.

    Congress finds as follows:
            (1) Ukraine allows its citizens the right and opportunity to 
        emigrate, free of any heavy tax on emigration or on the visas or 
        other documents required for emigration and free of any tax, 
        levy, fine, fee, or other charge on any citizens as a 
        consequence of the desire of such citizens to emigrate to the 
        country of their choice.
            (2) Ukraine has received normal trade relations treatment 
        since 1992 and has been found to be in full compliance with the 
        freedom of emigration requirements under title IV of the Trade 
        Act of 1974 since 1997.
            (3) Since the establishment of an independent Ukraine in 
        1991, Ukraine has made substantial progress toward the creation 
        of democratic institutions and a free-market economy.
            (4) Ukraine has committed itself to ensuring freedom of 
        religion, respect for rights of minorities, and eliminating 
        intolerance and has been a paragon of inter-ethnic cooperation 
        and harmony, as evidenced by the annual human rights reports of 
        the Organization for Security and Cooperation in Europe (OSCE) 
        and the United States Department of State.
            (5) Ukraine has taken major steps toward global security by 
        ratifying the Treaty on the Reduction and Limitation of 
        Strategic Offensive Weapons (START I) and the Treaty on the Non-
        Proliferation of Nuclear Weapons, subsequently turning over the 
        last of its Soviet-era nuclear warheads on June 1, 1996, and 
        agreeing, in 1998, not to assist Iran with the completion of a 
        program to develop and build nuclear breeding reactors, and has 
        fully supported the United States in nullifying the Anti-
        Ballistic Missile (ABM) Treaty.
            (6) At the Madrid Summit in 1997, Ukraine became a member of 
        the North Atlantic Cooperation Council of the North Atlantic 
        Treaty Organization (NATO), and has been a participant in the 
        Partnership for Peace (PfP) program since 1994.
            (7) Ukraine is a peaceful state which established exemplary 
        relations with all neighboring countries, and consistently 
        pursues a course of European integration with a commitment to 
        ensuring democracy and prosperity for its citizens.

[[Page 120 STAT. 314]]

            (8) Ukraine has built a broad and durable relationship with 
        the United States and has been an unwavering ally in the 
        struggle against international terrorism that has taken place 
        since the attacks against the United States that occurred on 
        September 11, 2001.
            (9) Ukraine has concluded a bilateral trade agreement with 
        the United States that entered into force on June 23, 1992, and 
        is in the process of acceding to the World Trade Organization 
        (WTO). On March 6, 2006, the United States and Ukraine signed a 
        bilateral market access agreement as a part of the WTO accession 
        process.

SEC. 2. <<NOTE: 19 USC 2434 note.>> TERMINATION OF APPLICATION OF TITLE 
            IV OF THE TRADE ACT OF 1974 TO THE PRODUCTS OF UKRAINE.

    (a) Presidential Determinations and Extension of Nondiscriminatory 
Treatment.--Notwithstanding any provision of title IV of the Trade Act 
of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2431 et seq.), the President may--
            (1) determine that such title should no longer apply to 
        Ukraine; and
            (2) after making a determination under paragraph (1) with 
        respect to Ukraine, proclaim the extension of nondiscriminatory 
        treatment (normal trade relations treatment) to the products of 
        that country.

    (b) Termination of Applicability of Title IV.--On and after the 
effective date under subsection (a) of the extension of 
nondiscriminatory treatment to the products of Ukraine, title IV of the 
Trade Act of 1974 shall cease to apply to that country.

    Approved March 23, 2006.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 1053 (S. 632):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 152 (2006):
            Mar. 8, considered and passed House.
            Mar. 9, considered and passed Senate.
WEEKLY COMPILATION OF PRESIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS, Vol. 42 (2006):
            Mar. 23, Presidential remarks.

                                  <all>