Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/02/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/02/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/02/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/09/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/05/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/05/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/28/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/31/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/14/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/10/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/21/2006