Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/21/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/25/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/17/2005