Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/03/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/28/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/27/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/19/2006