Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/26/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 09/28/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/07/2005