Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/16/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/12/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/17/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/01/2006