Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/08/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/05/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/05/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/26/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/18/2005