Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2006