Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/13/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/26/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2006