Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/18/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/02/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/12/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/04/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/05/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/09/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/28/2006