Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/03/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/24/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/27/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/07/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/22/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/22/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/08/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/26/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/20/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/26/2006