Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/10/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/10/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/10/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/08/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/17/2006