Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2005