Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/03/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/15/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/12/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/25/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/25/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/26/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/06/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/25/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/25/2006