Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/15/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/15/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/05/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/12/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/04/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/04/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/04/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/04/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/11/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/11/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/11/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/25/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/07/2005