There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

JUBILEE Act of 2005
Justice and Understanding By International Loan Elimination and Equity Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the cancellation of debts owed to international financial institutions by poor countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/03/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/19/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3685)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/03/2005Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/16/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/05/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/05/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/13/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/13/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/20/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/20/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/18/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/03/2005 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology03/28/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1130.


Subjects (123)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1130. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/03/2005)

Justice and Understanding By International Loan Elimination and Equity Act of 2005 or JUBILEE Act of 2005 - Amends the International Financial Institutions Act to require the Secretary of the Treasury to commence immediate efforts, within the Paris Club of Official Creditors, the International Monetary Fund (IMF), the International Bank for Reconstruction and Development (World Bank), and other international financial institutions (multilateral development institutions (MDI's)) to accomplish: (1) the cancellation of all debts owed to each institution by specified eligible poor countries, and the financing of such debt cancellation from the institution's ongoing operations, procedures, and accounts; (2) the limitation of any waiting period before receipt of debt cancellation to one month from the date of an eligible poor country's application for it; and (3) encouragement of the government of each eligible poor country to allocate at least 20 percent of its national budget, including the savings from such debt cancellation, for the provision of basic health care services, education services, and clean water services to individuals in the country.

Sets forth requirements for: (1) establishment of a framework to ensure transparency regarding each international financial institution's activities; and (2) availability on the Treasury Department's website of U.S. Executive Directors' remarks at meetings of international financial institutions' Boards of Directors.

Requires the Secretary to commence immediate efforts, within the Paris Club, the IMF, and other appropriate MDI's, to ensure that the provision of debt cancellation to such countries is not conditioned on any agreement by such a country to implement or comply with specified policies that deepen poverty or degrade the environment.