Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/05/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/08/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/2006