Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/14/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/19/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/19/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/19/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/09/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/17/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/14/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/22/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/22/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/22/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/15/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/15/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/29/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/07/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/10/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/16/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/16/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/08/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/01/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/08/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/18/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/20/2006