There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the proper tax treatment of certain disaster mitigation payments.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
04/15/2005Became Public Law No: 109-7. (TXT | PDF)
04/15/2005Signed by President.
04/14/2005Presented to President.
04/14/2005Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H2082-2083; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2082)
04/13/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/13/2005Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1389)
03/07/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
04/15/2005Became Public Law No: 109-7. (TXT | PDF)
04/15/2005Signed by President.
04/14/2005HousePresented to President.
04/14/2005-4:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/14/2005-4:21pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H2082-2083; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2082)
04/14/2005-4:21pmHouseMr. Foley asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
04/14/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/13/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/13/2005SenateS.Amdt.411 Amendment SA 411 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
04/13/2005SenateS.Amdt.411 Amendment SA 411 proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator Baucus. (consideration: CR S3605; text: CR S3605) To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the proper tax treatment of certain disaster mitigation payments.
04/13/2005SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3604-3605)
04/13/2005SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
03/14/2005-3:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/2005-3:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1389)
03/14/2005-3:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1134.
03/14/2005-3:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1388-1394)
03/14/2005-3:07pmHouseMr. Foley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/07/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
03/07/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/07/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/10/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/07/2005 Referred to
Senate Finance03/15/2005 Referred to
04/13/2005 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1134. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-7 (04/15/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on April 13, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income disaster mitigation payments (in addition to disaster relief payments) paid to property owners pursuant to the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act or the National Flood Insurance Act (as in effect on the date of enactment of this Act). Exempts property for which excludable payments are received from an increase in cost basis.

Treats any sale or transfer of property to the Federal Government, a State or local government, or an Indian tribal government to implement hazard mitigation under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act or the National Flood Insurance Act as an involuntary conversion for purposes of determining the taxable gain from such sale or transfer.

Provides that the amendments made by this Act with respect to the tax exclusion for disaster mitigation payments and the tax treatment of dispositions of property under hazard mitigation programs shall apply to transactions before, on, or after the date of enactment of this Act.