Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/06/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/25/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 01/25/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/25/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/25/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/25/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/25/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/25/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/25/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/25/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/25/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/25/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/25/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/25/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/25/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/25/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/25/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/25/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/25/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/25/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/25/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/25/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/25/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/25/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/25/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/01/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/16/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/15/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/13/2005