Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/26/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/28/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 11/01/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/01/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/01/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/07/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/07/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/10/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/10/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/10/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/16/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/16/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/08/2005