Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/10/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/10/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/10/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/10/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/10/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/10/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/10/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/14/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/15/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/15/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/06/2005