Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/09/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/14/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/15/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/13/2006