Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/23/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/13/2006