Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/25/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/15/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 11/08/2005