Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/26/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/13/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/13/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/13/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/06/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/06/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/08/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/29/2006