Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/21/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/21/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/28/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/04/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/24/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/24/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/24/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/22/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/18/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/15/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/28/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/05/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/05/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/21/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2006