Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/09/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/09/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/13/2006