Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/09/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/09/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/17/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/26/2005