Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/09/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/17/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/03/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/17/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/09/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/09/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/09/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/29/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/18/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/01/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/06/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/26/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/14/2006