Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/21/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/25/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/18/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/31/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/14/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/25/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/08/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/27/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/07/2006