There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Health Security Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for health care for every American and to control the cost and enhance the quality of the health care system.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/09/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/06/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/22/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/09/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/09/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/29/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/29/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/21/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/15/2006

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/09/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/22/2005 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/09/2005 Referred to
House Government Reform03/09/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services03/09/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/06/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1200.


Subjects (189)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1200. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/2005)

American Health Security Act of 2005 - Establishes the State-Based American Health Security Program to provide every U.S. resident who is a U.S. citizen, national, or lawful resident alien with health care services. Requires each participating State to establish a State health security program.

Eliminates benefits under: (1) titles XVIII (Medicare), XIX (Medicaid), and XXI (State Children's Health Insurance) (SCHIP) of the Social Security Act; (2) the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program; and (3) the Civilian Health and Medical Program of the Uniformed Services (CHAMPUS).

Requires each State health security program to prohibit the sale of health insurance in that State that duplicates benefits provided under the program.

Establishes the American Health Security Standards Board to: (1) develop policies, procedures, guidelines and requirements to carry out this Act; (2) establish uniform reporting requirements; (3) provide for an American Health Security Advisory Council and an Advisory Committee on Health Professional Education; and (4) establish a national health security budget specifying the total Federal and State expenditures to be made for covered health care services.

Establishes the American Health Security Quality Council to: (1) review and evaluate practice guidelines, standards of quality, performance measures, and medical review criteria; and (2) develop minimum competence criteria.

Establishes the Office of Primary Care and Prevention Research within the Office of the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH).

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to create the American Health Security Trust Fund and appropriates to the Fund specified tax liabilities and current health program receipts.