Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/09/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/29/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/29/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/21/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/15/2006