Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/23/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/2005