Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/14/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/17/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/13/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/06/2006