Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 03/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/17/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/03/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/24/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/23/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/21/2005