Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/16/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/16/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/16/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/13/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/14/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/14/2006