Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/10/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/17/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/13/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/13/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/11/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/25/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/26/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/22/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/01/2006