There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase, effective as of December 1, 2005, the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain service-connected disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/13/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5749-5751)
06/30/2005Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 109-162.
03/10/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/14/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/13/2005-11:13amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/13/2005-11:13amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5749-5751)
07/13/2005-10:47amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1220.
07/13/2005-10:47amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5749-5754)
07/13/2005-10:46amHouseMr. Buyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/30/2005HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 98.
06/30/2005HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 109-162.
06/23/2005HouseProvisions of H.R. 2959 Incorporated in This Measure, Section 6.
06/23/2005HouseProvisions of H.R. 2988 Incorporated in This Measure, Section 5.
06/23/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/23/2005HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/23/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/09/2005HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
06/09/2005HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
04/04/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/10/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/10/2005HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E412)
03/10/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (27)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/10/2005 Referred to
06/23/2005 Hearings by
06/23/2005 Markup by
06/30/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-162
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs04/04/2005 Referred to
06/09/2005 Markup by
06/09/2005 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/14/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1220. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/13/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 30, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2005 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2005, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled adult children, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.

Codifies under veterans' disability compensation provisions the increases to such compensation provided under the Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2004.

Directs the Secretary to conduct a two-year demonstration project for the improvement of business practices of the Veterans Health Administration (VHA). Requires: (1) the Secretary to enter into a performance-based contract for a contractor to carry out the demonstration project; (2) such project to be conducted at two VHA facilities having a relatively low performance in the recovery or collection of indebtedness from third-party payers for the provision of veterans' medical care; (3) a VHA employee to be designated as the full-time project manager; (4) the Secretary to submit interim reports and a final report to Congress on project operations; and (5) the Comptroller General to review the project and report review results to Congress. Authorizes appropriations.

Directs the Secretary to designate, establish, and operate at selected Department of Veterans Affairs health-care facilities six centers for Parkinson's disease research, education, and clinical activities. Requires the Under Secretary for Health to establish a panel to assess the scientific and clinical merit of proposals submitted by a facility for the operation of such a center. Authorizes appropriations.