Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/19/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/25/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/26/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/03/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/03/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/15/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/06/2006