Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/15/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/19/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/26/2006