Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/16/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/24/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/13/2005