Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/03/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/09/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/14/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/18/2006