Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/25/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2005