Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/12/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/12/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/26/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/22/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/07/2006