Text: H.R.1245 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-475 (01/12/2007)

 
[109th Congress Public Law 475]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ475.109]

[[Page 120 STAT. 3565]]

Public Law 109-475
109th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To provide for programs to increase the awareness and knowledge of women 
         and health care providers with respect to gynecologic 
            cancers. <<NOTE: Jan. 12, 2007 -  [H.R. 1245]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress <<NOTE: Gynecologic Cancer 
Education and Awareness Act of 2005.>> assembled,

SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 42 USC 201 note.>> SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Gynecologic Cancer Education and 
Awareness Act of 2005'' or ``Johanna's Law''.

SEC. 2. AMENDMENT TO THE PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE ACT.

    Section 317P of the Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. 247b-17) is 
amended--
            (1) in the section heading by adding ``(johanna's law)'' at 
        the end; and
            (2) by adding at the end the following:

    ``(d) Johanna's Law.--
            ``(1) National public awareness campaign.--
                    ``(A) In general.--The Secretary shall carry out a 
                national campaign to increase the awareness and 
                knowledge of health care providers and women with 
                respect to gynecologic cancers.
                    ``(B) Written materials.--Activities under the 
                national campaign under subparagraph (A) shall include--
                          ``(i) maintaining a supply of written 
                      materials that provide information to the public 
                      on gynecologic cancers; and
                          ``(ii) distributing the materials to members 
                      of the public upon request.
                    ``(C) Public service announcements.--Activities 
                under the national campaign under subparagraph (A) 
                shall, in accordance with applicable law and 
                regulations, include developing and placing, in 
                telecommunications media, public service announcements 
                intended to encourage women to discuss with their 
                physicians their risks of gynecologic cancers. Such 
                announcements shall inform the public on the manner in 
                which the written materials referred to in subparagraph 
                (B) can be obtained upon request, and shall call 
                attention to early warning signs and risk factors based 
                on the best available medical information.
            ``(2) Report and strategy.--
                    ``(A) Report.--Not later than 6 months after the 
                date of the enactment of this subsection, the Secretary 
                shall submit to the Congress a report including the 
                following:

[[Page 120 STAT. 3566]]

                          ``(i) A description of the past and present 
                      activities of the Department of Health and Human 
                      Services to increase awareness and knowledge of 
                      the public with respect to different types of 
                      cancer, including gynecologic cancers.
                          ``(ii) A description of the past and present 
                      activities of the Department of Health and Human 
                      Services to increase awareness and knowledge of 
                      health care providers with respect to different 
                      types of cancer, including gynecologic cancers.
                          ``(iii) For each activity described pursuant 
                      to clause (i) or (ii), a description of the 
                      following:
                                    ``(I) The funding for such activity 
                                for fiscal year 2006 and the cumulative 
                                funding for such activity for previous 
                                fiscal years.
                                    ``(II) The background and history of 
                                such activity, including--
                                            ``(aa) the goals of such 
                                        activity;
                                            ``(bb) the communications 
                                        objectives of such activity;
                                            ``(cc) the identity of each 
                                        agency within the Department of 
                                        Health and Human Services 
                                        responsible for any aspect of 
                                        the activity; and
                                            ``(dd) how such activity is 
                                        or was expected to result in 
                                        change.
                                    ``(III) How long the activity lasted 
                                or is expected to last.
                                    ``(IV) The outcomes observed and the 
                                evaluation methods, if any, that have 
                                been, are being, or will be used with 
                                respect to such activity.
                                    ``(V) For each such outcome or 
                                evaluation method, a description of the 
                                associated results, analyses, and 
                                conclusions.
                    ``(B) Strategy.--
                          ``(i) Development; submission 
                      to <<NOTE: Deadline.>> congress.--Not later than 3 
                      months after submitting the report required by 
                      subparagraph (A), the Secretary shall develop and 
                      submit to the Congress a strategy for improving 
                      efforts to increase awareness and knowledge of the 
                      public and health care providers with respect to 
                      different types of cancer, including gynecological 
                      cancers.
                          ``(ii) Consultation.--In developing the 
                      strategy under clause (i), the Secretary should 
                      consult with qualified private sector groups, 
                      including nonprofit organizations.
            ``(3) Full <<NOTE: Deadlines. Reports.>> compliance.--
                    ``(A) In general.--Not later than March 1, 2008, the 
                Secretary shall ensure that all provisions of this 
                section, including activities directed to be carried out 
                by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and 
                the Food and Drug Administration, are fully implemented 
                and being complied with. <<NOTE: Certification.>> Not 
                later than April 30, 2008, the Secretary shall submit to 
                Congress a report that certifies compliance with the 
                preceding sentence and that contains a description of 
                all activities undertaken to achieve such compliance.

[[Page 120 STAT. 3567]]

                    ``(B) If the Secretary fails to submit the 
                certification as provided for under subparagraph (A), 
                the Secretary shall, not later than 3 months after the 
                date on which the report is to be submitted under 
                subparagraph (A), and every 3 months thereafter, submit 
                to Congress an explanation as to why the Secretary has 
                not yet complied with the first sentence of subparagraph 
                (A), a detailed description of all actions undertaken 
                within the month for which the report is being submitted 
                to bring the Secretary into compliance with such 
                sentence, and the anticipated date the Secretary expects 
                to be in full compliance with such sentence.
            ``(4) Authorization of appropriations.--For the purpose of 
        carrying out this subsection, there is authorized to be 
        appropriated $16,500,000 for the period of fiscal years 2007 
        through 2009.''.

    Approved January 12, 2007.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 1245:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 152 (2006):
            Nov. 14, considered and passed House.
            Dec. 8, considered and passed Senate, amended. House 
                concurred in Senate amendment.

                                  <all>