Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/17/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/17/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/17/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/17/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/12/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/12/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/04/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/23/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/24/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/24/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/28/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/29/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/12/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/12/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/13/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/13/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/13/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/19/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/28/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/06/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/06/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/14/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/14/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/21/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/21/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/06/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/17/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/17/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/18/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/18/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/18/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 11/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/30/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/30/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/30/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/13/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2006