Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/14/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/14/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/06/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/20/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/25/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/15/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/15/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/02/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/02/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/02/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/02/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/04/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/06/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/22/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/13/2006