Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/20/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/16/2005