Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/13/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/21/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/05/2005